NY S06730 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - PRINT NUMBER 6730A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 14 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-30 - PRINT NUMBER 6730A
Pending: Senate Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to promoting understanding, awareness and enforcement of animal crime laws.
Title
Relates to promoting understanding, awareness and enforcement of animal crime laws.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6730A |
2012-05-30 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2012-05-01 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO CODES |
2012-03-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A09917 (Same As) 2012-05-31 - print number 9917a