NY S06664 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.270
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-19 - SIGNED CHAP.270
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of environmental conservation to lease state land, associated utility lines and television translator system to the Tioga county bureau of fire and other occupants.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of environmental conservation to lease state land, associated utility lines and television translator system to the Tioga county bureau of fire and other occupants.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Akshar [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-19 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.270 |
2016-08-08 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.394 |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | substituted for a7897b |
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-07 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6664A |
2016-05-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1062 |
2016-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07897 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - substituted by s6664a