NY S06648 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-24 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain counties, cities and school districts to impose up to a four percent rate of sales and compensating use taxes; preserves the authority of certain counties and a city to impose such taxes at rates in excess of four percent.
Title
Authorizes certain counties, cities and school districts to impose up to a four percent rate of sales and compensating use taxes; preserves the authority of certain counties and a city to impose such taxes at rates in excess of four percent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE | |
2010-03-03 | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-02-25 | PRINT NUMBER 6648A | |
2010-02-25 | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS | |
2010-01-22 | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A10418 (Same As) 2010-07-01 - held for consideration in ways and means