NY S06643 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - PRINT NUMBER 6643A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - PRINT NUMBER 6643A
Pending: Senate Crime Victims, Crime and Correction Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for eligible incarcerated individuals to receive a monthly stipend upon release from a state correctional facility.
Title
Provides for eligible incarcerated individuals to receive a monthly stipend upon release from a state correctional facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6643A |
2024-02-29 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2023-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A09115 (Same As) 2024-02-07 - referred to correction