NY S06624 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-31 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9400
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the chief administrator of the courts' authority to allow referees to determine certain applications to a family court for an order of protection.
Title
Extends the chief administrator of the courts' authority to allow referees to determine certain applications to a family court for an order of protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9400 |
2012-05-21 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.787 |
2012-03-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A09400 (Same As) 2012-07-18 - signed chap.137