NY S06619 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.720
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - SIGNED CHAP.720
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Delays reductions in the ordinary death benefit payable to members of the New York State and Local Retirement and the New York State and Local Police and Fire Retirement System to ensure that no reduction before a member becomes retirement eligible for an unreduced retirement from age 61 to 62 for members in Tiers 1-5 and 63 for members in Tier 6.
Title
Delays reductions in the ordinary death benefit payable to members of the New York State and Local Retirement and the New York State and Local Police and Fire Retirement System to ensure that no reduction before a member becomes retirement eligible for an unreduced retirement from age 61 to 62 for members in Tiers 1-5 and 63 for members in Tier 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.720 |
2022-12-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.312 |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | substituted for a7730a |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-03 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1011 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6619B |
2022-02-14 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2021-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2021-05-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1299 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6619A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2021-05-18 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2021-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07730 (Same As) 2022-05-23 - substituted by s6619b