NY S06586 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 10 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a gold star father distinctive number plate.
Title
Establishes a gold star father distinctive number plate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2016-05-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.655 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A00907 (Same As) 2016-01-06 - referred to transportation