NY S06572 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-07-28 - SIGNED CHAP.269
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization of the county of Cayuga to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes to 11/30/2025.
Title
Extends the authorization of the county of Cayuga to impose an additional one percent of sales and compensating use taxes to 11/30/2025.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - Senate - Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-28 | Senate | SIGNED CHAP.269 |
2023-07-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | home rule request |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.888 |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | substituted for a7026 |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2023-05-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.963 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07026 (Same As) 2023-06-21 - substituted by s6572