NY S06562 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits suspension of jury deliberations beyond 24 or 72 hours on certain days.
Title
Permits suspension of jury deliberations beyond 24 or 72 hours on certain days.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2018-03-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.713 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2017-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07448 (Same As) 2018-03-22 - REFERRED TO CODES