NY S06550 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.221
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Farmingdale public library to submit an application for real property tax exemption to the assessor of the county of Nassau.
Title
Authorizes the Farmingdale public library to submit an application for real property tax exemption to the assessor of the county of Nassau.
Sponsors
Sen. Kemp Hannon [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.221 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.450 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a9453b |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-20 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2012-06-11 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6550B |
2012-06-11 | Senate | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2012-06-08 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-06-08 | Assembly | RECALLED FROM ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-20 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2012-03-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-03-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.360 |
2012-03-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6550A |
2012-03-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-02-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09453 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6550b