NY S06538 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8177
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to justices presiding in an off-hours arraignment part.
Title
Relates to justices presiding in an off-hours arraignment part.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A8177 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-03-12 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.596 |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-06-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A08177 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - signed chap.231