NY S06526 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - referred to insurance
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "insurance modernization act of 2014" which relates to permitting all forms of signatures for continuing insurance education course providers; relates to expanding immunity protection for companies reporting certain fire losses; relates to allowing advance premium cooperative investment in certificates of deposit.
Title
Enacts the "insurance modernization act of 2014" which relates to permitting all forms of signatures for continuing insurance education course providers; relates to expanding immunity protection for companies reporting certain fire losses; relates to allowing advance premium cooperative investment in certificates of deposit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2014-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-04-29 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6526A |
2014-03-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-03-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-03-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.241 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |