NY S06516 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - SIGNED CHAP.66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-22 - SIGNED CHAP.66
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health to report data on opioid overdoses on a county basis; such reporting shall occur annually on or before October 1; such data shall be posted on the department of health website; such commissioner shall provide the data to counties on a monthly basis.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health to report data on opioid overdoses on a county basis; such reporting shall occur annually on or before October 1; such data shall be posted on the department of health website; such commissioner shall provide the data to counties on a monthly basis.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.66 |
2016-06-21 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.691 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a9251a |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | referred to health |
2016-05-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.672 |
2016-04-15 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6516A |
2016-04-15 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2016-01-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09251 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - substituted by s6516a