NY S06504 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.357
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Saint Paraskevi Greek Orthodox Shrine Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes the Saint Paraskevi Greek Orthodox Shrine Church to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-04 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.357 |
2019-10-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.531 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8289 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1647 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08289 (Same As) 2019-10-04 - SIGNED CHAP.357