NY S06504 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-12 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds powers and duties to the canal corporation; directs the canal corporation to cause the design, preparation of plans, estimates and specifications and the supervision of the erection, construction, repair and removal of all structures referred to be performed by a licensed professional engineer; directs preparation of a flood response plan; makes related provisions.
Title
Adds powers and duties to the canal corporation; directs the canal corporation to cause the design, preparation of plans, estimates and specifications and the supervision of the erection, construction, repair and removal of all structures referred to be performed by a licensed professional engineer; directs preparation of a flood response plan; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-12 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2014-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-06-03 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-06-02 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1080 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-31 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A03579 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions