NY S06503 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-09 - SIGNED CHAP.317
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to meetings and absences of the board of regents.
Title
Relates to meetings and absences of the board of regents.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-09 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.317 |
2016-08-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.435 |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | substituted for a2921 |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | referred to education |
2016-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-02-24 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.218 |
2016-02-24 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-01-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A02921 (Same As) 2016-03-14 - substituted by s6503