NY S06490 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-10-03 - VETOED MEMO.167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides for the dissolution of union free school district number 13 in the town of Greenburgh in Westchester; and relates to eliminating reference to such union free school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides for the dissolution of union free school district number 13 in the town of Greenburgh in Westchester; and relates to eliminating reference to such union free school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-10-03AssemblyVETOED MEMO.167
2012-09-21SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.419
2012-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a9334a
2012-06-18Assemblyreferred to education
2012-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-12SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6490A
2012-04-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-04-19Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-04-18Senate1ST REPORT CAL.504
2012-02-15SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A09334 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6490a

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback