NY S06483 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the age requirements applicable to certain appointments or promotions of public employees who have been absent on military duty.
Title
Relates to the age requirements applicable to certain appointments or promotions of public employees who have been absent on military duty.
Sponsors
Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.23 |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.570 |
2019-11-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.667 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8348 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1639 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08348 (Same As) 2019-11-25 - APPROVAL MEMO.23