NY S06464 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-20 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Enacts the "state workforce injury reduction act"; requires state agencies to submit a written action plan for reducing occurrences of injuries in the coming year to the governor and the legislature.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Enacts the "state workforce injury reduction act"; requires state agencies to submit a written action plan for reducing occurrences of injuries in the coming year to the governor and the legislature.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-20Assemblyreturned to senate
2018-06-20Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-20Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.404
2018-06-20Assemblysubstituted for a4933b
2018-06-11Assemblyreferred to governmental employees
2018-06-11SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-11SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-11SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1666
2018-06-11SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2018-01-29SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2018-01-24SenatePRINT NUMBER 6464A
2018-01-24SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2017-05-23SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A04933 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - substituted by s6464a

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06464&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06464&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06464
Texthttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06464&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#S06464A
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6464#SC1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6464#SF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/S6464#SC2
Roll Callhttp://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=S06464&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback