NY S06460 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - signed chap.268
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the Unitarian Universalist Congregation of the Great South Bay Sayville to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Title
Permits the Unitarian Universalist Congregation of the Great South Bay Sayville to file an application for a real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Senate | signed chap.268 |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1636 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6460 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-13 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-13 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-11 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.128 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | rules report cal.128 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-06 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Senate | referred to real property taxation |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4912 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1636 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A04912 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - signed chap.268