NY S06459 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.179
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Friends of Science East, Inc. to file an application for a real property tax exemption for the 2013-2014 assessment roll.
Title
Authorizes Friends of Science East, Inc. to file an application for a real property tax exemption for the 2013-2014 assessment roll.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.179 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.64 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a8714 |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2016-03-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-03-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-03-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.265 |
2016-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08714 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s6459