NY S06436 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - APPROVAL MEMO.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on December 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-26 - APPROVAL MEMO.90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to equal pay for similar work protections for protected classes.
Title
Relates to equal pay for similar work protections for protected classes.
Sponsors
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Alessandra Biaggi [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] |
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.90 |
2019-12-26 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.741 |
2019-12-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.461 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | substituted for a7748a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1463 |
2019-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07748 (Same As) 2019-12-26 - APPROVAL MEMO.90