NY S06422 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - SIGNED CHAP.213
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Islip to accept an application for a real property tax exemption for a certain parcel owned by the Morgan Center.
Title
Authorizes the assessor of the town of Islip to accept an application for a real property tax exemption for a certain parcel owned by the Morgan Center.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 127 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.213 |
2012-07-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.213 |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | substituted for a9769 |
2012-03-07 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2012-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-03-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-02-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.232 |
2012-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09769 (Same As) 2012-06-14 - substituted by s6422