NY S06420 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of unsolicited disclosure of an intimate image as a violation; requires sexual harassment prevention training for individuals convicted of such offense.
Title
Establishes the offense of unsolicited disclosure of an intimate image as a violation; requires sexual harassment prevention training for individuals convicted of such offense.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2022-05-09 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1073 |
2022-03-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6420A |
2022-03-04 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-04-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A07156 (Same As) 2021-05-07 - enacting clause stricken
A00318 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - print number 318b
A00318 (Same As) 2022-03-03 - print number 318b