NY S06386 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-12 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-12 - TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the establishment of a biennial budgeting system for the state of New York replacing the state annual budget process.
Title
Provides for the establishment of a biennial budgeting system for the state of New York replacing the state annual budget process.
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-12 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-06-07 | Senate | OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2017-05-17 | Senate | TO ATTORNEY-GENERAL FOR OPINION |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A04190 (Same As) 2018-01-31 - opinion referred to judiciary