NY S06371 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - PRINT NUMBER 6371B
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to providing a final average salary disability retirement benefit to certain participants in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to providing a final average salary disability retirement benefit to certain participants in World Trade Center rescue, recovery, or cleanup operations.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 6371B
2018-06-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2018-01-03SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2017-06-15SenatePRINT NUMBER 6371A
2017-06-15SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
2017-05-11SenateREFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS

Same As/Similar To

A08433 (Same As) 2018-06-15 - print number 8433c

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback