NY S06349 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the New York city commissioner of finance to approve suitable rewards for information that leads to the detection of violations of the tax on cigarettes.
Title
Authorizes the New York city commissioner of finance to approve suitable rewards for information that leads to the detection of violations of the tax on cigarettes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A364 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1397 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-03-04 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
Same As/Similar To
A00364 (Same As) 2014-12-17 - tabled