NY S06338 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - PRINT NUMBER 6338A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires schools that have a Muslim or Jewish population greater than or equal to ten percent of the student body to offer Halal food options and/or Kosher food options during lunch.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires schools that have a Muslim or Jewish population greater than or equal to ten percent of the student body to offer Halal food options and/or Kosher food options during lunch.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-25SenatePRINT NUMBER 6338A
2024-03-25SenateAMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION
2024-01-03SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION
2023-04-17SenateREFERRED TO EDUCATION

Same As/Similar To

A10651 (Same As) 2024-07-22 - referred to education

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback