NY S06330 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.176
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.176
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to adding the Bash Bish to the definition of inland waterways.
Title
Relates to adding the Bash Bish to the definition of inland waterways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.176 |
2016-07-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.70 |
2016-06-08 | Assembly | substituted for a9508a |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-18 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-18 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 6330A |
2016-05-17 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.915 |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09508 (Same As) 2016-06-08 - substituted by s6330a