NY S06271 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO CITIES
Pending: Senate Cities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration for various provisions of law relating to real property tax exemptions for certain multiple dwellings in a city having a population of one million or more.
Title
Extends the expiration for various provisions of law relating to real property tax exemptions for certain multiple dwellings in a city having a population of one million or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Senate Cities Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1252 |
2017-05-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO CITIES |