NY S06252 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-10 - SIGNED CHAP.135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-10 - SIGNED CHAP.135
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the effectiveness of provisions related to licensing of establishments where animals or fowls are slaughtered.
Title
Extends the effectiveness of provisions related to licensing of establishments where animals or fowls are slaughtered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Agriculture Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-10 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.135 |
2020-07-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.430 |
2020-03-02 | Assembly | substituted for a8009 |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
2020-02-24 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-02-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-02-10 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2020-02-05 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.334 |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A08009 (Same As) 2020-08-10 - SIGNED CHAP.135