NY S06245 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 6245A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-27 - PRINT NUMBER 6245A
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the city of Rochester and the board of education of the city school district of the city of Rochester school facilities modernization program act by granting further authority to the RJSCB to modernize educational facilities in the city of Rochester.
Title
Amends the city of Rochester and the board of education of the city school district of the city of Rochester school facilities modernization program act by granting further authority to the RJSCB to modernize educational facilities in the city of Rochester.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6245A |
2020-05-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-05-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07976 (Same As) 2020-07-14 - enacting clause stricken
A11012 (Same As) 2020-09-09 - referred to education
A11012 (Same As) 2020-09-09 - referred to education