NY S06220 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-14 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "youth violence prevention task force act" to create the youth violence prevention task force to study and evaluate the effectiveness of current and existing programs related to the prevention of youth violence.
Title
Enacts the "youth violence prevention task force act" to create the youth violence prevention task force to study and evaluate the effectiveness of current and existing programs related to the prevention of youth violence.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2016-06-14 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1686 |
2016-06-14 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-06-08 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6220B |
2016-06-08 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-05-31 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6220A |
2016-05-31 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |