NY S06194 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-20 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to abolishing several commissions, committees, boards and panels, including the empire state plaza art commission, the interagency coordinating committee on rural public transportation, the armored cars advisory board, the appearance enhancement advisory committee, the plant industry advisory committee, the manufactured housing advisory council; the New York state collectable series panel and the child performer advisory board to prevent eating disorders; relates to rules and regulations for nail specialty, natural hair styling, aesthetics and cosmetology.
Title
Relates to abolishing several commissions, committees, boards and panels, including the empire state plaza art commission, the interagency coordinating committee on rural public transportation, the armored cars advisory board, the appearance enhancement advisory committee, the plant industry advisory committee, the manufactured housing advisory council; the New York state collectable series panel and the child performer advisory board to prevent eating disorders; relates to rules and regulations for nail specialty, natural hair styling, aesthetics and cosmetology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-20 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2012-06-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-04 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6194D |
2012-05-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-01 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 6194C |
2012-04-30 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.613 |
2012-04-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6194B |
2012-04-18 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2012-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6194A |
2012-02-07 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2012-01-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |