NY S06190 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - referred to transportation
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires that prior to the issuance of taxicab, limousine, commuter van, paratransit or for-hire vehicle driver or owner licenses for vehicles transporting nine or more passengers, the applicant shall be fingerprinted by the authority authorized to issue such licenses for the purpose of securing criminal history records from both the state division of criminal justice services and the federal bureau of investigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires that prior to the issuance of taxicab, limousine, commuter van, paratransit or for-hire vehicle driver or owner licenses for vehicles transporting nine or more passengers, the applicant shall be fingerprinted by the authority authorized to issue such licenses for the purpose of securing criminal history records from both the state division of criminal justice services and the federal bureau of investigation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-18Assemblyreferred to transportation
2019-06-18SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-14SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 6190B
2019-06-04SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2019-06-03Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2019-06-03SenateAMENDED (T) 6190A
2019-05-30Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1088
2019-05-21SenateREFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION

Same As/Similar To

A03286 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - referred to transportation
S05405 (Same As) 2019-05-21 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback