NY S06186 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6186A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - PRINT NUMBER 6186A
Pending: Senate Commerce, Economic Development and Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes local municipalities to establish tourism recovery improvement districts.
Title
Authorizes local municipalities to establish tourism recovery improvement districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Jamaal Bailey [D] | Sen. Leroy Comrie [D] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Mario Mattera [R] | Sen. Alexis Weik [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6186A |
2022-02-18 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
2021-04-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO COMMERCE, ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SMALL BUSINESS |
Same As/Similar To
A02149 (Same As) 2022-02-23 - print number 2149b