NY S06179 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes school election wards in the Warwick Valley Central School District.
Title
Establishes school election wards in the Warwick Valley Central School District.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | referred to education |
2019-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-12 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6179A |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1177 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A08012 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - referred to education