NY S06171 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.184
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to designating certain employees of the Seneca county sheriff's office serving as uniformed marine patrol officers and uniformed court security officers as peace officers.
Title
Relates to designating certain employees of the Seneca county sheriff's office serving as uniformed marine patrol officers and uniformed court security officers as peace officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-17 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.184 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.515 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a8989a |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2012-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-05-22 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6171A |
2012-05-07 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-05-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-05-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.646 |
2012-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08989 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s6171a