NY S06161 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-02 - referred to veterans' affairs
Pending: Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the issuance of a New York State Vietnam War Service Medal.
Title
Relates to the issuance of a New York State Vietnam War Service Medal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-02 | Assembly | referred to veterans' affairs |
2014-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-29 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING FROM SPECIAL REPORT CAL.954 |
2014-05-28 | Senate | SPECIAL REPORT CAL.954 |
2014-05-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO VETERANS, HOMELAND SECURITY AND MILITARY AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
A08334 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to veterans' affairs