NY S06149 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-06-21 - COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires signage alerting motorists of red light cameras in the areas where red light camera demonstration programs have been authorized.
Title
Requires signage alerting motorists of red light cameras in the areas where red light camera demonstration programs have been authorized.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-04-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-04-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-04-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.549 |
2012-02-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6149A |
2012-02-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2012-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
Same As/Similar To
A09618 (Same As) 2012-06-18 - reported referred to rules