NY S06111 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency; authorizes delivery by companies who do not own the cylinder, container or receptacle under certain circumstances provided the cylinder, container or receptacle has been inspected and certified as required by law or regulation.
Title
Authorizes the delivery of liquefied petroleum gas in times of emergency; authorizes delivery by companies who do not own the cylinder, container or receptacle under certain circumstances provided the cylinder, container or receptacle has been inspected and certified as required by law or regulation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | VOTE RECONSIDERED - RESTORED TO THIRD READING |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.74 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | DIED IN SENATE |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.914 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6111A |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-05-30 | Senate | advanced to third reading cal.478 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | reported |
2019-05-02 | Senate | print number 1434b |
2019-05-02 | Senate | amend and recommit to codes |
2019-02-27 | Senate | reported referred to codes |
2019-02-05 | Senate | print number 1434a |
2019-02-05 | Senate | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2019-01-15 | Senate | referred to agriculture |
2019-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A1434B |
2019-06-14 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 6111A |
2019-06-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.914 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
Same As/Similar To
A01434 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - ordered to third reading cal.74