NY S06082 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to primary social security retirement benefits for certain members; provides that in the computation of the normal service retirement benefit of members of the New York city fire department pension fund, there shall be no reduction for the primary social security retirement benefit.
Title
Relates to primary social security retirement benefits for certain members; provides that in the computation of the normal service retirement benefit of members of the New York city fire department pension fund, there shall be no reduction for the primary social security retirement benefit.
Sponsors
Sen. Andrew Gounardes [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] | Sen. Timothy Kennedy [D] | Sen. Mike Martucci [R] |
Sen. Diane Savino [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - Senate - Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-03-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6082A |
2022-03-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2021-04-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A06930 (Same As) 2022-04-12 - print number 6930b