NY S06074 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-03-21 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to expanding the right to assistance of counsel to include respondents in guardianship proceedings and kinship caregivers in custody and guardianship proceedings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to expanding the right to assistance of counsel to include respondents in guardianship proceedings and kinship caregivers in custody and guardianship proceedings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-21Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2022-03-21SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2022-03-21SenatePASSED SENATE
2022-03-09SenateAMENDED ON THIRD READING 6074A
2022-01-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2022-01-12Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2022-01-11Senate1ST REPORT CAL.126
2022-01-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2022-01-05SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY
2022-01-05Assemblyreturned to senate
2022-01-05Assemblydied in assembly
2021-06-02Assemblyreferred to children and families
2021-06-02SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2021-06-02SenatePASSED SENATE
2021-05-24SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1289
2021-05-24SenateCOMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
2021-05-11SenateREPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE
2021-04-05SenateREFERRED TO JUDICIARY

Same As/Similar To

A02581 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - reported referred to ways and means

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback