NY S06069 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-02 - referred to governmental operations
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a voluntary registry of individuals with autism, Alzheimer's or dementia who may be at risk of wandering away from home; creates a standardized form available that may be submitted to local law enforcement agencies by family members and caregivers of such individuals that would include identifying information and may include a photograph of the registrant.
Title
Establishes a voluntary registry of individuals with autism, Alzheimer's or dementia who may be at risk of wandering away from home; creates a standardized form available that may be submitted to local law enforcement agencies by family members and caregivers of such individuals that would include identifying information and may include a photograph of the registrant.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2022-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-02-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-02-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-02-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.467 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2021-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2021-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2021-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2021-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.970 |
2021-04-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |