NY S06042 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-06 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes an increase in the tuition of out-of-state residents for SUNY environmental science and forestry.
Title
Authorizes an increase in the tuition of out-of-state residents for SUNY environmental science and forestry.
Sponsors
Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-06 | Senate | tabled |
2019-12-06 | Senate | vetoed memo.175 |
2019-11-26 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | 3RD READING CAL.1517 |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6042A |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Senate | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-12 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.203 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | rules report cal.203 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | reported |
2019-06-05 | Senate | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-03 | Senate | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-05-30 | Senate | print number 7924a |
2019-05-30 | Senate | amend and recommit to higher education |
2019-05-28 | Senate | referred to higher education |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A7924A |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1517 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 6042A |
2019-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
2019-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO HIGHER EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07924 (Same As) 2019-12-06 - tabled