NY S06011 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO ELECTIONS
Pending: Senate Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the confidentiality of registration records for victims of domestic violence; may be obtained by an order from supreme court, county court or family court in the county where a victim of domestic violence is registered.
Title
Relates to the confidentiality of registration records for victims of domestic violence; may be obtained by an order from supreme court, county court or family court in the county where a victim of domestic violence is registered.
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Savino [D] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2017-06-21 | Senate | COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-05-24 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2017-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1087 |
2017-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A07793 (Same As) 2017-06-21 - substituted by s6749