NY S05971 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Investigations and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to providing a tax credit to employers who subsidize an employee's use of public transportation.
Title
Relates to providing a tax credit to employers who subsidize an employee's use of public transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5971A |
2017-05-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
2017-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08079 (Same As) 2018-04-30 - enacting clause stricken