NY S05969 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5969A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-26 - PRINT NUMBER 5969A
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to medically fragile young adults and pediatric specialized nursing facilities; allows for such young adults to remain in such facilities from age twenty-one until age thirty-six.
Title
Relates to medically fragile young adults and pediatric specialized nursing facilities; allows for such young adults to remain in such facilities from age twenty-one until age thirty-six.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5969A |
2024-02-26 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2023-03-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A03674 (Same As) 2024-03-06 - print number 3674a