NY S05965 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on October 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5965B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5965B
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the department of motor vehicles to issue limited purpose drivers' licenses to certain applicants.
Title
Authorizes the department of motor vehicles to issue limited purpose drivers' licenses to certain applicants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5965B |
2014-02-14 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO TRANSPORTATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2013-10-28 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5965A |
2013-10-28 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2013-10-23 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08257 (Same As) 2014-02-18 - print number 8257a