NY S05936 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to death benefits for certain members under the jurisdiction of the department of corrections and community supervision.
Title
Relates to death benefits for certain members under the jurisdiction of the department of corrections and community supervision.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Ritchie [R] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] | Sen. Rich Funke [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] |
Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2016-06-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1957 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2016-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5936B |
2016-03-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-02-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5936A |
2016-02-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-01-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2015-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07801 (Same As) 2016-05-24 - reported referred to ways and means
S05936 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means
S05936 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - referred to ways and means